Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
Sponsored by
Senator Kelly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the creation of a lien on owner-occupied residential property by contract or as a result of a breach of contract for the payment of medical debt.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0673
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page