Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Originators, and Servicers - Workgroup and Regulations
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to convene a stakeholder workgroup to develop recommendations for improving certain consumer complaint procedures, holding certain meeting with consumers and representatives of the independent housing counselor industry, and providing training to certain persons regarding complaints against mortgage lenders, originators, and servicers; requiring the Commissioner, in consultation with the stakeholder workgroup, to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Originators, and Servicers - Workgroup and Regulations
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page