Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health and Health Insurance - Behavioral Health Services - Expansion (Behavioral Health System Modernization Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to consider options for adopting existing programs or services to provide wraparound services to children and youth with primary substance use disorders and make recommendations regarding eligibility requirements for the 1915(i) waiver and mental health case management; and requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to study and report on operational issues related to commercial carrier reimbursement of behavioral health clinical peer specialists and crisis response services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0935
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103624/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health and Health Insurance - Behavioral Health Services - Expansion (Behavioral Health System Modernization Act)
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {103624/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health and Health Insurance - Behavioral Health Services - Expansion (Behavioral Health System Modernization Act)
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 8:33 AM
Click to return on the top page