Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker and Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability in the Department of Legislative Services; requiring the Office to conduct certain performance evaluations of certain units of State government; renaming the Joint Audit Committee as the Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee with an expanded role in reviewing evaluations conducted by the Office; requiring the Office to conduct certain investigations under certain circumstances; altering the manner in which certain governmental units are evaluated; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1113
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m. (House Rules and Executive Nominations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (House Rules and Executive Nominations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {163226/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations Rules and Executive Nominations 43AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m. (House Rules and Executive Nominations)
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (House Rules and Executive Nominations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Text - Chapter - State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
(   2-1206, 2-1230 through 2-1241, 2-1234 through 2-1241, 2-1243 through 2-1249, 2-1247, 2-1251, 2-1256, 2-601, 2-602, 2-605, 8-401, 8-402, 8-403, 8-404, 8-405 through 8-409, 8-408, 8-410, 8-411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page