Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-BF (Banquet Facility) License
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza and Eckardt
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Class B-BF (banquet facility) beer, wine, and liquor license in Wicomico County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Wicomico County to issue the license for use by banquet facilities that can accommodate the public for certain functions, contain a dining room capable of serving full-course meals for at least 100 individuals, and have adequate public bathroom facilities; and establishing a license fee of $1,500.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1181
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653924/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-BF (Banquet Facility) License
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {653924/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-BF (Banquet Facility) License
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Economic Matters 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Text - Chapter - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-BF (Banquet Facility) License
Last Updated: 6/16/2022 11:17 AM
Click to return on the top page