Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Salling, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the suspension or expulsion of prekindergarten, kindergarten, first grade, or second grade students from public schools with specified exceptions for an expulsion required by federal law or a suspension for not more than 5 school days under specified circumstances; requiring the principal or school administration to contact a student's parent or guardian under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484035/1
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484035/1
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484035/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {413522/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (18-28)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-46)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {484035/1 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments {484035/1 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Favorable with Amendments {484035/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {413522/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (18-28) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (92-46) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
(   4-319, 7-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page