Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Astle, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Middleton, Norman, Ready, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing the limitation on the amount of military retirement income that may be subtracted from federal adjusted gross income for State income tax purposes; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0442 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page