Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - St. Luke's United Methodist Church Fellowship Hall
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $200,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of St. Luke's United Methodist Church for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the St. Luke's United Methodist Church Fellowship Hall; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0816
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2018 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 151). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 151 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - St. Luke's United Methodist Church Fellowship Hall
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page