Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Oaks, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management, University System of Maryland system institutions, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, and Baltimore City Community College to provide certain information on certain employees to certain exclusive representatives within 30 days of a new employee's date of hire; requiring an exclusive representative to withhold certain communication with an employee under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1017
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {557879/1
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {557879/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {183925/1 (Senator Middleton)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {183925/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {793228/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (16-29)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {423227/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {473121/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-30)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-48)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Orientation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {557879/1 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {557879/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {183925/1 (Senator Middleton) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {183925/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {793228/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (16-29) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {423227/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {473121/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-30) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-48) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Text - Chapter - State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program
(   3-208, 3-2A-08, 3-307, 3-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page