Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Sponsored by
Cecil County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that certain funds credited to the Fair Hill Improvement Fund be used exclusively for the grounds and facilities within the special event area at Fair Hill; authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,800,000 to the Fund; and authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to use certain funds for certain grants to certain entities for certain purposes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0658
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2022
Legislative Date
2/05/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-1)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2022 2/05/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {393921/1 Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-1) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Text - Chapter - Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page