Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fire Protection and Prevention – Residential Rental Property – Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing certain requirements relating to the installation of certain fire safety equipment in residential rental high-rise buildings and certain other property; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit; establishing the Workgroup to Develop Fire Safety Best Practices for Pre-1974 High-Rise Apartment Buildings; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations by December 31, 2024; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0823
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024, July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {813227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Fire Protection and Prevention – Residential Rental Property – Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act)
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments {813227/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Fire Protection and Prevention – Residential Rental Property – Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act)
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 10:59 AM
Click to return on the top page