Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a specified notice requirement for a claim under the Local Government Tort Claims Act; repealing a requirement that a claimant submit a claim within a specified time to the State Treasurer or a designee of the State Treasurer under the Maryland Tort Claims Act; and appying the Act prospectively.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page