Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Health Commissions and Maryland Insurance Administration – Study
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to contract with an independent consultant to conduct a certain study of the Health Services Cost Review Commission, the Maryland Health Care Commission, the Maryland Insurance Administration, and the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission; and requiring the Department to submit a report on the results of the study to the Governor, the Senate Finance Committee, and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before January 1, 2026.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0887
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health – Health Commissions and Maryland Insurance Administration – Study
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Favorable Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health – Health Commissions and Maryland Insurance Administration – Study
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/29/2024 10:50 AM
Click to return on the top page