Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza and Bailey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program in the Department of Natural Resources to certify forest product operators who export firewood to other states and use heat treatment and other procedures to prevent the presence of wood boring pest infestations, wood inhabiting pests, and plant disease pathogens in the firewood products.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1140
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page