Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Agricultural Research and Exposition Foundation
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Miller, and Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $150,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Agricultural Research & Exposition Foundation, Inc. for the specified development or improvement purposes related to property, located in Harford County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2016 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 71). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 71 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page