Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Telehealth – Coverage for Breast Cancer Services
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Benson, and Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that the health care services appropriately delivered through telehealth include diagnostic and symptom management services for breast cancer delivered to a patient in a home setting for the purpose of certain provisions of law requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations and the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide certain coverage and reimbursement for health care services delivered through telehealth; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1197
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Telehealth – Coverage for Breast Cancer Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Telehealth – Coverage for Breast Cancer Services
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-105.2 )
(   15-139 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page