Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Hettleman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that there is a Compliance Officer within the Office of the Inspector General in the Maryland Department of Health; authorizing the Inspector General to investigate behavior in the Department that threatens public safety or demonstrates negligence, incompetence, or malfeasance; and requiring the Inspector General, the Compliance Officer, or a designated Assistant Inspector General to respond within 30 business days to an individual who has filed a complaint or allegation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-28)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General and Emergency Procurement Audits
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {443428/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {753127/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (106-28) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page