Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Internet-Delivered Absentee Ballot Study
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections to submit a report on the costs and resources required to process Internet-delivered absentee ballots during elections in the State to the Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee and the House Ways and Means Committee on or before September 1, 2024.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Internet-Delivered Absentee Ballot Study
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/22/2024 4:53 PM
Click to return on the top page