Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Oaks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations on ways Western Maryland counties, Southern Maryland counties, Eastern Shore counties, and Frederick, Carroll, and Harford counties can work together to obtain federal assistance to improve specified communications services and accessibility in the specified counties; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by November 30, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1169
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997576/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Task Force on Internet, Wireless, and Cellular Service on the Eastern Shore
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {997576/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Text - Chapter - Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page