Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Professional Development Evaluation Systems
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to develop and implement professional development evaluation systems that are based on teacher feedback and will enable the county board to assess teacher satisfaction and measure the effectiveness and relevancy of the activity; requiring each county board to report annually the results to the State Department of Education; requiring the Department to report annually to the Governor and General Assembly; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
(   6-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page