Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court from issuing a body attachment for an individual for failure to appear in court in response to a specified show cause order unless the court makes specified findings; prohibiting money paid by an individual arrested on a body attachment or another person on behalf of the individual to obtain the individual's release from being applied to reduce the amount of an outstanding money judgment or otherwise forfeited to the judgment creditor unless the court makes specified findings; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1435
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page