Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Notification
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Astle, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a State's Attorney to notify the court, before a defendant is sentenced, that a conviction prohibits a person from possessing a specified firearm under specified provisions of law; requiring a court to inform a person convicted of a specified disqualifying offense, both verbally and in writing, that the person is prohibited from possessing a firearm under specified provisions of law; and providing that the failure to receive a specified notification is not grounds for relief or a defense for specified criminal violations.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1424
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1001 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {188273/1
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {188273/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {133527/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (10-32)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Notification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {188273/1 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {188273/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Floor Amendment {133527/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (10-32) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Notification
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page