Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Parole Supervision Fees and Drug and Alcohol Abuse Test Payment - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement for the Maryland Parole Commission to assess a fee against an individual on parole and supervised by the Division of Parole and Probation under certain circumstances; and repealing authorization for the Division of Parole and Probation to require a supervisee of the Division who is on parole to pay for certain drug or alcohol abuse testing under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0531
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-3)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Services - Parole Supervision Fees and Drug and Alcohol Abuse Test Payment - Repeal
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Parole Supervision Fees and Drug and Alcohol Abuse Test Payment - Repeal
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (33-3) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page