Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Ramirez, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 745
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a municipality from requiring an individual to provide a certain reason in order to vote by absentee ballot.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0829
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0025 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {863025/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-26)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-7)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {833222/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (48-86)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 745
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Floor Amendment {863025/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-26) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (38-7) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Ways and Means 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {833222/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (48-86) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 745
Text - Chapter -
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page