Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, Guzzone, King, Lee, Manno, Peters, Smith, Ferguson, Madaleno, and McFadden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 659
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the services to be provided by specified sexual assault crisis programs; specifying criteria for receiving specified grant funding; requiring the Governor to include $3,000,000 each fiscal year in the State budget; authorizing the Governor, under specified circumstances, to reduce a specified appropriation; establishing the Maryland Sexual Assault Evidence Kit Policy and Funding Committee; requiring the Attorney General to adopt specified regulations in consultation with the Committee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {949239/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 659
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {949239/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations and Judiciary
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 659
Text - Chapter - Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
(   11-923, 11-927 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page