Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Kelley, Ferguson, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Lee, McFadden, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the process by which a person who is denied a certain handgun permit or renewal of a permit or whose permit is revoked or limited by the Secretary of State Police or the Secretary's designee may appeal the decision; providing that appeals from a certain decision by the Secretary or the Secretary's designee may be made to the Handgun Permit Review Board; requiring the Board to review a certain record and hold a hearing within 60 days of the last hearing; requiring the Board to report annually to the Governor and General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0819
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1180 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {698976/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-22)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {698976/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (115-22) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-301, 5-302, 5-311, 5-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page