Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Guzzone, and Rosapepe
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Superintendent of Schools to provide a county superintendent of schools, if the State Superintendent plans to remove the county superintendent, with the reason for removal, documentation to support the case for removal, and the opportunity to request a hearing within 10 days; authorizing a county board of education to remove a county superintendent in a certain manner; and authorizing a county superintendent to appeal a certain decision by the county board to the State Board.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0238
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764431/1
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764431/1
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764431/1
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624638/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {653020/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted (31-15)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {983125/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {764431/1 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {764431/1 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {764431/1 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Lam) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {624638/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Floor Amendment {653020/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted (31-15) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Lam) Adopted 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Floor Amendment {983125/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
(   4-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page