Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Information Technology - Prohibited Applications and Websites
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Bailey, Brooks, Charles, Elfreth, Gallion, Gile, Hester, James, Ready, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain employees, agents, or entities on any information technology owned or leased by a unit of State government from downloading or using any application, including TikTok or WeChat, or accessing any website developed by ByteDance Ltd. or Tencent Holdings Ltd; requiring by December 31, 2024, the Department of Budget and Management, in collaboration with the Department of Information Technology, to prepare guidance for units of State government regarding access to certain applications and websites; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0617
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1141 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Information Technology - Prohibited Applications and Websites
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - State Information Technology - Prohibited Applications and Websites
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 8:33 PM
Click to return on the top page