Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Benefits for Agricultural Land - Exclusion of Solar Farms
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a certain special use value assessment of certain agricultural land does not apply to land used for the generation of electricity from solar energy; prohibiting a certain property tax credit for agricultural land from being granted for tax imposed on land used for the generation of electricity from solar energy; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1013
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - Benefits for Agricultural Land - Exclusion of Solar Farms
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
(   8-209, 9-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page