Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Religious Group or Organization - Third-Party Leases
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that real property owned by a religious group or organization that is leased to a third party does not qualify for a certain property tax exemption, and if only part of the real property is leased to a third party, only that part so leased does not qualify for the exemption.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553020/1
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553020/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Exemption - Religious Group or Organization - Third-Party Leases
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments {553020/1 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/11/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {553020/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Exemption - Religious Group or Organization - Third-Party Leases
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2022 3/18/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 10:06 PM
Click to return on the top page