Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland Civic Excellence Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Ready
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Civic Excellence Program as a voluntary program in which local school systems may participate to recognize students and public schools that promote the civic readiness and civic engagement of students in public schools in the State; and requiring by July 1, 2026, and each July 1 thereafter, each participating local school system to submit to the Department a report on the Program in the most recent school year.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0271 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Maryland Civic Excellence Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Education - Maryland Civic Excellence Program - Established
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/16/2024 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page