Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the powers and duties of the State Board of Master Electricians; changing the name of the State Board of Master Electricians to the State Board of Electricians; prohibiting, beginning on July 1, 2021, local jurisdictions from issuing certain licenses; replacing local electrician licenses with local electrician registrations; prohibiting an individual from employing an individual to provide or assist in providing electrical services unless the individual meets certain licensing requirements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1262
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794836/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253791/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-25)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Washington and Reilly)
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Washington and Reilly)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crosby, Rogers and Adams)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crosby, Rogers and Adams)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Conference Committee Report {803928/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Conference Committee Report {803928/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-23)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {794836/1 Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Economic Matters 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {253791/1 Adopted 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (108-25) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 39AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 39AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Washington and Reilly) 39AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Washington and Reilly) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 House Refuses Recede 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crosby, Rogers and Adams) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 House Refuses Recede 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crosby, Rogers and Adams) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Conference Committee Report {803928/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Conference Committee Report {803928/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (114-23) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Last Updated: 4/19/2021 10:03 AM
Click to return on the top page