Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Currie, Eckardt, Hershey, McFadden, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of certain income tax disparity grants to counties and Baltimore City under certain circumstances and for certain fiscal years; and extending a certain termination provision by 2 years.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1624
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {999236/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {999236/1 Adopted 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Text - Chapter - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page