Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that an electric low speed scooter is considered to be a bicycle for the purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; providing that an electric low speed scooter is not a motorized minibike, motor scooter, or motor vehicle for the purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; establishing that the operator of an electric low speed scooter may ride by standing on a certain platform; providing that provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law do not prevent a local authority from regulating, in its jurisdiction, the operation of bicycles; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0748
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938179/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {180817/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {938179/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {180817/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
(   11-104, 11-117.2, 11-134.4, 11-134.5, 11-135, 11-154.1, 21-1202, 21-1203, 25-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page