Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Peer Advisory Committees, Scopes of Practice, and Licensure Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Nursing to appoint peer advisory committees to provide advice related to midwifery; authorizing licensed nurses certified as nurse-midwives and licensed certified midwives to personally prepare and dispense a starter dosage of certain drugs under certain circumstances; altering the exceptions to the certified midwifery licensure requirement and the qualifications required for a license; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0717
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2023
Legislative Date
2/08/2023
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {833025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/08/2023 2/08/2023 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Peer Advisory Committees, Scopes of Practice, and Licensure Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2023 3/30/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments {833025/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Nursing - Peer Advisory Committees, Scopes of Practice, and Licensure Requirements
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page