- Title
- Public Utilities - Solar Energy Systems and Programs, Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund, and Prevailing Wage (Brighter Tomorrow Act)
- Sponsored by
- Senators Elfreth, Augustine, Beidle, Brooks, Feldman, Guzzone, Hester, Hettleman, and Kagan
- Status
- In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
- Analysis
- Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that certain home improvement contracts for the installation of a solar energy generating system on the roof of a building include the installation of a certain wildlife barrier under certain circumstances; requiring a county or municipality to implement certain software for features supporting the tracking and approval of residential building permits for certain residential solar energy projects, residential energy storage projects, and main electric panel alterations by August 1, 2025 except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1435
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024, July 1, 2024, January 1, 2025
History
Toggle History Dropdown
File Code
Toggle Filecode Dropdown
Subjects
Toggle Subjects Dropdown
Statutes
Toggle Statutes Dropdown
(
1-1319 )
(
9-2016, 9-20B-05
)
Last Updated: 4/22/2024 10:38 AM