Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Assessments and Taxation, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 /CH0856
Title
Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0154 /CH0972 (SB0286/CH0973)
Title
Homeowners' and Homestead Property Tax Credits - Application Filing Deadline - Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245
Title
Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 (SB0576)
Title
Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271
Title
Limited Liability Companies - Articles of Organization - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation and Department of General Services - Property Appraisal Aids - Geographic Images
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0640 (SB0869)
Title
Property Tax - Improvements on Agricultural Land - Assessment
Sponsor
Delegate Ziegler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Right to Start Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Eligible Properties - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1399
Title
Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Public Information
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435 (SB0783/CH0595)
Title
Renewable Energy - Net Energy Metering Aggregation, Solar Renewable Energy Credits, and Taxes on Solar Energy Generating Systems (Brighter Tomorrow Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262
Title
Charitable Organizations - Late Fees and Registration - Suspension and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286 /CH0973 (HB0154/CH0972)
Title
Homeowners' and Homestead Property Tax Credits - Application Filing Deadline - Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289 /CH0385
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Office of the Director - Administrative Expenses
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423 /CH0362
Title
Real Property - Recordation - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 /CH0862 (HB0391)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0248)
Title
Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0733
Title
Task Force to Study Transparency in Tax Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 /CH0595 (HB1435)
Title
Public Utilities - Solar Energy Systems and Programs, Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund, and Prevailing Wage (Brighter Tomorrow Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0884
Title
Real Property - Recordation - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954
Title
Corporations and Associations - Transparency - Beneficial Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1159
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Events - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 /CH0856 Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 856
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0154 /CH0972 (SB0286/CH0973) Homeowners' and Homestead Property Tax Credits - Application Filing Deadline - Extension Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 972
Ways and Means
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0245 Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2024 - 2:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0248 (SB0576) Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0271 Limited Liability Companies - Articles of Organization - Required Information Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 State Department of Assessments and Taxation and Department of General Services - Property Appraisal Aids - Geographic Images Delegate Fair 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0640 (SB0869) Property Tax - Improvements on Agricultural Land - Assessment Delegate Ziegler 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB1314 Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Right to Start Act) Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Eligible Properties - Alteration Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1399 Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Public Information Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1435 (SB0783/CH0595) Renewable Energy - Net Energy Metering Aggregation, Solar Renewable Energy Credits, and Taxes on Solar Energy Generating Systems (Brighter Tomorrow Act) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 Charitable Organizations - Late Fees and Registration - Suspension and Cancellation Requirements Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0286 /CH0973 (HB0154/CH0972) Homeowners' and Homestead Property Tax Credits - Application Filing Deadline - Extension Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 973
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 /CH0385 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Office of the Director - Administrative Expenses Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0423 /CH0362 Real Property - Recordation - Procedures Senator James 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0429 /CH0862 (HB0391) Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 862
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB0248) Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0733 Task Force to Study Transparency in Tax Incentives Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 /CH0595 (HB1435) Public Utilities - Solar Energy Systems and Programs, Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund, and Prevailing Wage (Brighter Tomorrow Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0884 Real Property - Recordation - Procedures Senator James 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0954 Corporations and Associations - Transparency - Beneficial Ownership Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1159 Criminal Law - Unruly Social Events - Prohibition Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page