Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Sponsored by
Senator McCray (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, for each fiscal year beginning on or after July 1, 2022, that the appropriation in the Baltimore City budget to Visit Baltimore will be calculated from the actual hotel room tax receipts received from the immediately preceding 3-year rolling average; and extending to 2027 the termination date of the appropriation for Visit Baltimore.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1301
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {159034/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {159034/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Appropriations 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/26/2021 6:56 AM
Click to return on the top page