Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations – Limited License to Practice Dentistry – Services for Adults
Sponsored by
Senators McKay and Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to waive certain education requirements for certain applicants for a limited license to practice dentistry who provide dental services for adults.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0786
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Occupations – Limited License to Practice Dentistry – Services for Adults
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Favorable with Amendments {923429/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations – Limited License to Practice Dentistry – Services for Adults
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/4/2024 8:04 AM
Click to return on the top page