Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Oaks, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, and Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to extend to employees of the Judicial Branch and the Legislative Branch of State government the application of any program, policy, or practice through which free ridership on transit vehicles is offered to employees of the Executive Branch of State government.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1382 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Reassigned to Finance Budget and Taxation 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page