Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance
Sponsored by
Senators Lee and Smith
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person charged with reckless driving that contributes to an accident to appear in court and prohibiting the person from prepaying the fine.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0112
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0868 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {428176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {428176/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-101, 11-145, 21-901.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page