Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to require an insurer to reduce certain rates for certain private passenger automobile insurance policies and file certain changes and amendments or rates under certain circumstances; repealing certain confidentiality protections for certain proprietary rate-related information; exempting private passenger motor vehicle insurance from certain provisions of law governing the use of territory as a factor in establishing certain automobile insurance rates; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:25 PM
Click to return on the top page