Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, McFadden, and Smith
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Community Development Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; requiring the Department to administer the Program; establishing the Community Development Board in the Department; establishing the Community Development Fund to provide financial assistance to community development projects and community development organizations around the State; requiring the Board to report its recommendations and on the activities of the fund to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31 of each year.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1514
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0836 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {749138/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {749138/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   6-601 through 6-609 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page