Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions of law related to the execution of wills, powers of attorney, and advance directives to authorize the electronic execution and remote witnessing of those documents under certain circumstances; providing that a will, a power of attorney, a notarization of a power of attorney, or an advance directive executed in conformance with the provisions of certain executive orders shall be deemed to satisfy certain requirements under the Act; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1261
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {428774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {428774/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Judiciary 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 10:12 AM
Click to return on the top page