Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2023
Sponsored by
Senator McKay
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain condition under which the Board of License Commissioners of Garrett County may issue a certain alcoholic beverages license to a hotel or motel; authorizing a gift basket permit holder to purchase certain alcoholic beverages from a wholesaler; authorizing a holder of a Class C multiple day beer license, beer and wine license, or beer, wine, and liquor license to hold another license that is issued by the Board; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0905
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2023
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2023
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
4/10/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
4/01/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
4/04/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/03/2023
Legislative Date
5/03/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2023
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2023
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2023 3/07/2023 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Favorable Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2023
Senate 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Economic Matters 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2023 4/10/2023 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/10/2023 4/01/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2023 4/04/2023 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2023 3/30/2023 Returned Passed
Post Passage 5/03/2023 5/03/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text - Chapter - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2023
Last Updated: 5/9/2023 4:38 PM
Click to return on the top page