Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the application of certain provisions of the Maryland Consumer Loan Law; providing that compliance with a certain federal law and certain federal regulations constitute compliance with certain provisions of the Maryland Consumer Loan Law; altering the maximum interest rates that a certain lender may charge for certain loans; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0603
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   12-301, 12-302, 12-303 through 12-307.1, 12-308, 12-309, 12-310 through 12-312, 12-314, 12-315.1, 12-316, 12-316.1, 12-317 )
(   11-201, 11-202, 11-203.1, 11-204, 11-206, 11-213, 11-215, 11-219, 11-222, 11-223 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page