Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker and King
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 532
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill a certain appropriation in order to provide a $500 bonus to certain public school employees in fiscal year 2024; and requiring the State Department of Education to collect data from each county board of education and Baltimore City on the number of noncertificated education support professionals employed during the 2021-2022 school year and to submit a report on the data by September 15, 2022, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education Support Professionals - Workgroup and Bonus
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education Support Professionals - Workgroup and Bonus
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {673126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-31)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 532
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Education Support Professionals - Workgroup and Bonus
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {433422/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education Support Professionals - Workgroup and Bonus
Senate 3/22/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/17/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {673126/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (105-31) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 532
Text - Chapter - Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:04 PM
Click to return on the top page