Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to conduct a baseline study of cannabis use in the State; establishing the Cannabis Business Assistance Fund in the Department of Commerce to provide assistance to small, minority, and women-owned businesses entering the adult-use cannabis industry; altering certain provisions relating to penalties, charging procedures, expungement, shielding, and sentencing for certain marijuana-related offenses; legalizing the use and possession of marijuana under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, January 1, 2023, July 1, 2023
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243326/1
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Motion Re-referred Judicial Proceedings (Senator Salling) Rejected (18-26)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243326/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {733728/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {613623/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {503526/1 (Senator Carter) Rejected
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {413022/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cannabis Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243326/1 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Motion Re-referred Judicial Proceedings (Senator Salling) Rejected (18-26) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243326/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Floor Amendment {733728/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Floor Amendment {613623/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Floor Amendment {503526/1 (Senator Carter) Rejected 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Floor Amendment {413022/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cannabis Reform
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 47 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-105.3, 10-105.4 )
(   23-101 through 23-702 )
(   12.5-101 through 12.5-104 )
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:57 AM
Click to return on the top page