Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget; specifying the purpose of the Workgroup, to be convened by the Department of Budget and Management, is to study, evaluate, and make recommendations concerning budgeting models used by state or local governments in the United States that utilize well-defined service categories to set priorities and allocate resources; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Budget - Appropriations - Funding Priorities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {879838/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Budget - Appropriations - Funding Priorities
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Favorable with Amendments {879838/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page