Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting individuals who have successfully obtained a high school diploma by examination from certain requirements relating to the Guaranteed Access Grant, subject to certain qualifications; requiring certain individuals to meet certain qualifications under certain circumstances; altering a certain age for eligibility for the Guaranteed Access Grant under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0781
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724330/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {724330/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Ways and Means 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination
(   18-301, 18-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page